MI HB5839 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Marihuana: administration; spouses of applicants for licensure who hold certain positions in certain governmental bodies; prohibit the marijuana regulatory agency from denying an application based on. Amends sec. 7 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27957).
Title
Marihuana: administration; spouses of applicants for licensure who hold certain positions in certain governmental bodies; prohibit the marijuana regulatory agency from denying an application based on. Amends sec. 7 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27957).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 96 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 96 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022 |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 10:56 Am |
2022-12-06 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-06 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 477 Yeas 93 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2022-12-06 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In By 3/4 Vote |
2022-11-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-11-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-06-15 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 Yeas 96 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-06-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Pat Outman |