MI HB5829 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 549'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 549'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Education; safety; school districts, public school academies, and nonpublic schools to designate school safety liaison and submit to inspections by state police; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1241 & 1241a.
Title
Education; safety; school districts, public school academies, and nonpublic schools to designate school safety liaison and submit to inspections by state police; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1241 & 1241a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 958 (Y: 100 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 843 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 276 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 269 (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 843 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 276 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 269 (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 549'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:48 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 5:11 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:18 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Roll Call # 958 Yeas 100 Nays 7 |
2018-12-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 843 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2018-05-08 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-08 | House | Passed Roll Call # 276 Yeas 97 Nays 12 |
2018-05-08 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2018-05-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 269 Yeas 95 Nays 14 |
2018-05-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-04-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |