MI HB5827 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 298'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 298'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: other; clinical practice requirement for dental therapists; expand to include other states. Amends sec. 16651 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16651).
Title
Health occupations: other; clinical practice requirement for dental therapists; expand to include other states. Amends sec. 16651 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16651).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 497 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 254 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 254 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 298'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 02:08 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 10:18 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 05:43 Pm |
2020-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 497 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 254 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-06-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-06-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/03/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |
Subjects
Health occupations: dentists
Health occupations: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health occupations: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs