MI HB5814 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; solid waste; financial assurance provisions; revise. Amends secs. 11523, 11523a, 11523b, 11525, 11525a & 11525b of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11523 et seq.); by designating secs. 11523 & 11525f as subpt. 4 & adds secs. 11525d & 11525f. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5815'20, HB 5816'20, HB 5812'20, HB 5813'20, HB 5817'20
Title
Environmental protection; solid waste; financial assurance provisions; revise. Amends secs. 11523, 11523a, 11523b, 11525, 11525a & 11525b of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11523 et seq.); by designating secs. 11523 & 11525f as subpt. 4 & adds secs. 11525d & 11525f. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5815'20, HB 5816'20, HB 5812'20, HB 5813'20, HB 5817'20
Sponsors
Rep. Yousef Rabhi [D] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Joseph Tate [D] | Rep. William Sowerby [D] |
Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. Scott VanSingel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-06-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/02/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2020-05-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-05-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Yousef Rabhi |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5814 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5814.htm |