MI HB5805 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 530'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 530'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health; health care sharing ministries freedom to share act; enact to recognize ministries and provide they are not engaging in the business of insurance. Creates new act.
Title
Insurance; health; health care sharing ministries freedom to share act; enact to recognize ministries and provide they are not engaging in the business of insurance. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 945 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 603 (Y: 77 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 603 (Y: 77 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 530'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 5:12 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:46 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:48 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 945 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-11-27 | House | Transmitted |
2012-11-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 603 Yeas 77 Nays 30 |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-11 | House | Per Rule 41 Re-referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-09-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/16/2012 |
2012-08-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2012-08-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-08-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Lisa Lyons |