MI HB5802 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; penalties for driving on suspended license; modify. Amends secs. 317, 904 & 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.317 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5685'20, HB 5686'20, HB 5688'20, HB 5691'20, HB 5698'20, HB 5699'20
Title
Traffic control: driver license; penalties for driving on suspended license; modify. Amends secs. 317, 904 & 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.317 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5685'20, HB 5686'20, HB 5688'20, HB 5691'20, HB 5698'20, HB 5699'20
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. Graham Filler [R] | Rep. Kyra Bolden [D] | Rep. Ryan Berman [R] |
Rep. Gary Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-07-21 | House | Transmitted |
2020-07-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-07-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-07-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-07-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-07-21 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-07-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Not Adopted |
2020-07-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-05-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/20/2020 |
2020-05-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-05-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-05-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller |