MI HB5799 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; other; procedure for the removal of official on the state board of education, the board of regents of the University of Michigan, the board of trustees of Michigan State University, or the board of governors of Wayne State University; clarify. Amends sec. 293 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.293).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; other; procedure for the removal of official on the state board of education, the board of regents of the University of Michigan, the board of trustees of Michigan State University, or the board of governors of Wayne State University; clarify. Amends sec. 293 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.293).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-06-07SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-06-07SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-05-29SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-05-24HouseTransmitted
2018-05-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 Yeas 108 Nays 1
2018-05-24HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-05-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-24HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-23HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-04-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2018
2018-04-12HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2018-04-12HouseRead A First Time
2018-04-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback