MI HB5783 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-31 - Assigned Pa 195'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Individual income tax: other; qualified higher education expenses under the Michigan education savings program; conform with most recent federal modifications. Amends secs. 2 & 16 of 2000 PA 161 (MCL 390.1472 & 390.1486).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income tax: other; qualified higher education expenses under the Michigan education savings program; conform with most recent federal modifications. Amends secs. 2 & 16 of 2000 PA 161 (MCL 390.1472 & 390.1486).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 635 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 195'24
2024-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 01/16/2025 02:28 Pm
2024-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 01/16/2025 01:10 Pm
2024-12-31HousePresented To The Governor 01/08/2025 12:48 Pm
2024-12-31HouseBill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024
2024-12-05HouseFull Title Agreed To
2024-12-31HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
2024-12-19SenateReturned To House
2024-12-19SenateInserted Full Title
2024-12-05SenatePassed Roll Call # 635 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2024-12-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2024-12-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2024-12-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2024-12-10SenateRules Suspended
2024-12-10SenatePassed By House With Immediate Effect
2024-12-05HouseTransmitted
2024-12-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
2024-12-05HouseRead A Third Time
2024-12-05HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2024-12-05HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-12-05HouseRead A Second Time
2024-11-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-11-13HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2024-06-06HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2024
2024-06-05HouseReferred To Committee On Higher Education
2024-06-05HouseRead A First Time
2024-06-05HouseIntroduced By Representative Christine Morse

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2024-HB-5783
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2024-HIB-5783.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2024-HEBH-5783.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2024-HEBS-5783.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/House/htm/2024-HNB-5783.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2024-PA-0195.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5782-981E1386.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-5783-L.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-11-13-077.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-12-19-109.htm

Bill Comments

feedback