MI HB5771 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-07 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-07 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disabilities; other; reference to department of health and human services in the blind and visually disabled persons act; update and repeal outdated section. Amends sec. 3 of 1978 PA 260 (MCL 333.353) & repeals sec. 16 of 1978 PA 260 (MCL 393.366).
Title
Disabilities; other; reference to department of health and human services in the blind and visually disabled persons act; update and repeal outdated section. Amends sec. 3 of 1978 PA 260 (MCL 333.353) & repeals sec. 16 of 1978 PA 260 (MCL 393.366).
Sponsors
Rep. Harvey Santana [D] | Rep. Robert Kosowski [D] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Andrea LaFontaine [R] |
Rep. Larry Inman [R] | Rep. Laura Cox [R] | Rep. George Darany [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-08-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/13/2016 |
2016-07-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2016-07-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-07-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Harvey Santana |
Subjects
Disabilities: other
State agencies (existing): community health
State agencies (existing): human services
State agencies (existing): community health
State agencies (existing): human services