MI HB5765 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-13 - Assigned Pa 217'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-13 - Assigned Pa 217'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement: state employees; retired corrections officers to work as needed; allow under certain circumstances without losing retirement allowance. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c).
Title
Retirement: state employees; retired corrections officers to work as needed; allow under certain circumstances without losing retirement allowance. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 441 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 155 (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 155 (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Assigned Pa 217'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-10-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2022 01:06 Pm |
2022-10-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/14/2022 11:52 Am |
2022-09-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/05/2022 12:25 Pm |
2022-09-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-28 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-09-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 441 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 155 Yeas 101 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-04-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/17/2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |