MI HB5764 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Counties; other; provision related to contracts or agreements for the purchase of real or personal property for public use; modify. Amends sec. 10, ch. IV of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.10).
Title
Counties; other; provision related to contracts or agreements for the purchase of real or personal property for public use; modify. Amends sec. 10, ch. IV of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.10).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/10/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-04-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Dianda |