MI HB5762 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Water: water supply systems; clean water assistance and safe drinking water assistance funds allow use for energy efficiency water works projects; modify. Amends secs. 5301, 5403, 5405 & 5406 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5301 et seq.).
Title
Water: water supply systems; clean water assistance and safe drinking water assistance funds allow use for energy efficiency water works projects; modify. Amends secs. 5301, 5403, 5405 & 5406 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5301 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-05-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/06/2020 |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2020-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Beth Griffin |
Subjects
Energy: conservation and efficiency
Environmental protection: water pollution
Water: water supply systems
Environmental protection: water pollution
Water: water supply systems