MI HB5751 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Animals: other; regulate the certification of an individual's need for an emotional support animal; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Animals: other; regulate the certification of an individual's need for an emotional support animal; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 393 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 393 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2022-05-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/16/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Sara Cambensy |