MI HB5747 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Assigned Pa 128'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Assigned Pa 128'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Food: milk; issuance of certificates of free sale in manufacturing milk law of 2001; provide for. Amends 2001 PA 267 (MCL 288.561 - 288.740) by adding sec. 92.
Title
Food: milk; issuance of certificates of free sale in manufacturing milk law of 2001; provide for. Amends 2001 PA 267 (MCL 288.561 - 288.740) by adding sec. 92.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Assigned Pa 128'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-06-29 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/29/2022 02:36 Pm |
2022-06-29 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/29/2022 01:16 Pm |
2022-06-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/21/2022 11:00 Am |
2022-06-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2022-03-23 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-03-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/16/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2022-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Bryan Posthumus |