MI HB5727 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 625'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 625'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; purchasing; energy-based performance contracting for governmental energy use; require. Creates new act.
Title
State financing and management; purchasing; energy-based performance contracting for governmental energy use; require. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 840 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 900 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 588 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 900 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 588 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 625'12 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 4:16 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/8/2013 @ 9:04 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:36 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 840 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 900 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2012-09-27 | House | Transmitted |
2012-09-27 | House | Title Amended |
2012-09-27 | House | Passed Roll Call # 588 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2012-09-27 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-06-07 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/07/2012 |
2012-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2012-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Joe Haveman |
Subjects
Energy, conservation
Local government, audits
Local government, other
State financing and management, purchasing
Local government, audits
Local government, other
State financing and management, purchasing