MI HB5717 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for false representation regarding assisted reproduction; provide for. Amends secs. 16l & 16y, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16l & 777.16y).
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for false representation regarding assisted reproduction; provide for. Amends secs. 16l & 16y, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16l & 777.16y).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 73 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 73 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-06-30 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-30 | House | Title Amended |
2022-06-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 73 Nays 33 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-30 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/02/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2022-02-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced By Representative John Roth |