MI HB5702 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; forfeiture; prosecutional review of civil asset forfeiture in controlled substances cases; require. Amends sec. 7523 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7523).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; forfeiture; prosecutional review of civil asset forfeiture in controlled substances cases; require. Amends sec. 7523 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7523).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-11-27HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-03-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/08/2017
2018-03-08HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-03-08HouseRead A First Time
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Runestad

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback