MI HB5692 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 531'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 531'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; arson; certain arson violations; revise elements of crimes and provide for increased penalties. Amends secs. 71, 72 & 73 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.71 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5693'12, HB 5694'12
Title
Crimes; arson; certain arson violations; revise elements of crimes and provide for increased penalties. Amends secs. 71, 72 & 73 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.71 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5693'12, HB 5694'12
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Rep. Richard LeBlanc [D] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] |
Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] | Rep. John Walsh [R] | Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 850 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 947 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 621 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 947 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 621 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 531'12 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:16 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:38 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:40 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 850 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Rule Suspended |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 947 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-28 | House | Transmitted |
2012-11-28 | House | Passed Roll Call # 621 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-05-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/30/2012 |
2012-05-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-05-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-29 | House | Introduced By Representative John Walsh |