MI HB5686 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-21 - Re-referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-21 - Re-referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Education: other; process concerning changes to the pupil accounting manual and pupil auditing manual; modify. Amends sec. 18 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1618).
Title
Education: other; process concerning changes to the pupil accounting manual and pupil auditing manual; modify. Amends sec. 18 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1618).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 325 (Y: 56 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 328 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 (Y: 54 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 328 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 (Y: 54 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Education |
2022-07-01 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 07/01/2022 |
2022-06-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/23/2022 12:22 Pm |
2022-06-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-21 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 325 Yeas 56 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-06-21 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-06-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-06-16 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 328 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2022-02-23 | House | Transmitted |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 Yeas 54 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-02-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2022-01-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/25/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2022-01-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |