MI HB5682 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: assaultive; penalties for certain kinds of assault; modify. Amends secs. 81, 81a & 82 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.81 et seq.).
Title
Crimes: assaultive; penalties for certain kinds of assault; modify. Amends secs. 81, 81a & 82 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.81 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 (Y: 88 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2022-03-16 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 Yeas 88 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-03-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2022-01-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/25/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2022-01-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller |