MI HB5681 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims: statements; victim impact statements; allow to be made remotely. Amends secs. 15, 43 & 75 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.765 et seq.).
Title
Crime victims: statements; victim impact statements; allow to be made remotely. Amends secs. 15, 43 & 75 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.765 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 313 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2022-06-15 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 313 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-06-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-01-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/18/2022 |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2022-01-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom |