MI HB5672 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 545'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Highways; name; portion of M-15 in Oakland County; designate as the "Deputy Eric Overall Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 3b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highways; name; portion of M-15 in Oakland County; designate as the "Deputy Eric Overall Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 3b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 954 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 873 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 545'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:40 Pm
2018-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:55 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda
2018-12-28HousePresented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:02 Pm
2018-12-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-20HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-12-20House Roll Call # 954 Yeas 108 Nays 0
2018-12-20HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-12-20HouseRule Suspended
2018-12-20HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2018-12-18SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-18SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 873 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-12-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-12-18SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-12-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-12-18SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-18SenateRules Suspended
2018-12-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-12-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-12-18SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-05-02SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation
2018-05-01HouseTransmitted
2018-05-01HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2018-05-01HouseRead A Third Time
2018-04-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-04-24HouseRead A Second Time
2018-04-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-04-17HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-03-01HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2018
2018-02-28HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2018-02-28HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Tedder

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5672
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5672.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5672.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5672.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5672.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-04-17-036.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-01-042.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-18-080.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-12-20-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback