MI HB5669 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Assigned Pa 129'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Assigned Pa 129'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voting procedures; identification for election purposes; define. Amends secs. 2, 497c, 523, 523a, 761 & 813 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.2 et seq.).
Title
Elections; voting procedures; identification for election purposes; define. Amends secs. 2, 497c, 523, 523a, 761 & 813 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.2 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 234 (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 (Y: 62 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 (Y: 62 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Assigned Pa 129'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/3/2018 @ 11:34 Am |
2018-05-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/2/2018 @ 8:40 Pm |
2018-04-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/23/2018 @ 12:30 Pm |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-19 | House | Roll Call # 234 Yeas 64 Nays 45 |
2018-04-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-04-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-04-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 Yeas 27 Nays 8 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 Yeas 62 Nays 44 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2018-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |
Subjects
Elections: registration
Elections: voters
Elections: voting procedures
State agencies (existing): state
Elections: voters
Elections: voting procedures
State agencies (existing): state