MI HB5663 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-27 - Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs
Pending: Senate Local, Urban & State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-27 - Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs
Pending: Senate Local, Urban & State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; bonds; issuance of "green energy" bonds; allow. Creates new act.
Title
Local government; bonds; issuance of "green energy" bonds; allow. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs | |
2010-04-22 | Transmitted | |
2010-04-22 | Title Amended | |
2010-04-22 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 152 Yeas 65 Nays 42 | |
2010-04-22 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-04-22 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-04-22 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-03-02 | Recommendation Concurred In | |
2010-03-02 | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-12-09 | Printed Bill Filed 12/09/2009 | |
2009-12-08 | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology | |
2009-12-08 | Read A First Time | |
2009-12-08 | Introduced By Representative Joel Sheltrown |