MI HB5645 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Assigned Pa 282'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; witnesses; support dog when witness testifies; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 2163a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2163a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; witnesses; support dog when witness testifies; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 2163a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2163a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 459 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 284 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-25HouseAssigned Pa 282'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-07-25HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/29/2018 @ 11:08 Am
2018-07-25HouseApproved By The Governor 6/28/2018 @ 6:58 Am
2018-07-25HousePresented To The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 3:16 Pm
2018-06-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-06-12HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-06-12HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-06-12SenateInserted Full Title
2018-06-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 459 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-06-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-06-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-05-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-05-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-30SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-05-16SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-05-15HouseTransmitted
2018-05-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 284 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2018-05-15HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-09HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-09HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-01HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-01HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-02-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/27/2018
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-02-27HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced By Representative Tom Barrett

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5645
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5645.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5645.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5645.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5645.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0282.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-01-042.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-15-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-30-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-06-12-060.htm

Bill Comments

feedback