MI HB5642 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control; traffic regulation; certain criteria for operation of a vehicle at railroad crossings; expand. Amends sec. 669 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.669).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control; traffic regulation; certain criteria for operation of a vehicle at railroad crossings; expand. Amends sec. 669 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.669).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02HouseRe-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2018-05-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-29HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-02-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/27/2018
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2018-02-27HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced By Representative Tim Greimel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback