MI HB5631 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Animals: birds; Michigan woodcock recovery plan; create. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 40503.
Title
Animals: birds; Michigan woodcock recovery plan; create. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 40503.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cherry [D] | Rep. Jim Haadsma [D] | Rep. Tim Sneller [D] | Rep. Phil Green [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-12-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/09/2021 |
2021-12-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-12-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced By Representative John Cherry |