MI HB5628 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-03 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-03 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; no-fault; low-cost automobile insurance policy pilot program; establish. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding ch. 32A. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5627'09, HB 5629'09, HB 5630'09
Title
Insurance; no-fault; low-cost automobile insurance policy pilot program; establish. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding ch. 32A. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5627'09, HB 5629'09, HB 5630'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-03 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-12-03 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-12-02 | Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2009 | |
2009-12-01 | Referred To Committee On Insurance | |
2009-12-01 | Read A First Time | |
2009-12-01 | Introduced By Representative Mary Valentine |