MI HB5613 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: grants and transfers; state administrative board limitations; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1921 PA 2 (MCL 17.3). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0769'21, HB 5602'21
Title
Appropriations: grants and transfers; state administrative board limitations; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1921 PA 2 (MCL 17.3). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0769'21, HB 5602'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 636 (Y: 95 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-12-14 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 636 Yeas 95 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-12-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/07/2021 |
2021-12-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-12-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller |