MI HB5611 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Roll Call Roll Call # 119 Yeas 49 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Use tax: exemptions; sale of incontinence products; exempt. Amends secs. 4 & 21 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.94 & 205.111).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use tax: exemptions; sale of incontinence products; exempt. Amends secs. 4 & 21 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.94 & 205.111).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 119 (Y: 49 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Adverse Roll Call (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 119 Yeas 49 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2022-03-15HouseAdverse Roll Call
2022-03-15HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2022-03-15HouseRead A Third Time
2022-03-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2022-03-10HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2022-03-10HouseRead A Second Time
2022-02-01HouseReferred To Second Reading
2022-02-01HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-12-08HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 12/07/2021
2021-12-07HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2021-12-07HouseRead A First Time
2021-12-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Julie Alexander

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5611
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5611.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5611-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5611-0O3311.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5611-2BD7D0B7.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5611-5056D3F1.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5611-050D7DB5.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-02-01-008.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-03-15-026.htm

Bill Comments

feedback