MI HB5600 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Land use: land division; public utility easement as part of recorded plat; expand to include a public path, walkway, or sidewalk as part of the recorded plat. Amends sec. 222a of 1967 PA 288 (MCL 560.222a).
Title
Land use: land division; public utility easement as part of recorded plat; expand to include a public path, walkway, or sidewalk as part of the recorded plat. Amends sec. 222a of 1967 PA 288 (MCL 560.222a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-12-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/02/2021 |
2021-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-12-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |