MI HB5580 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-15)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Assigned Pa 69'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-15)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Assigned Pa 69'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education: financial aid; tuition incentive program; allow for certain other state aid to be last dollar. Amends sec. 256 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1856). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0268'19, HB 5576'20
Title
Higher education: financial aid; tuition incentive program; allow for certain other state aid to be last dollar. Amends sec. 256 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1856). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0268'19, HB 5576'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 186 (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Assigned Pa 69'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-25 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/02/2020 09:48 Am |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved By The Governor 04/02/2020 08:36 Am |
2020-03-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/19/2020 01:12 Pm |
2020-03-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-03-17 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 186 Yeas 84 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 16 |
2020-03-17 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-03-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-03-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-03-12 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 Yeas 95 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-03-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/10/2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Anthony |