MI HB5578 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Reassigned To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Reassigned To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; omnibus budget appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2018-2019. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; omnibus budget appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2018-2019. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Cox [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 244 (Y: 66 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-04-24 | House | Transmitted |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 244 Yeas 66 Nays 41 |
2018-04-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-04-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2018-04-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Laura Cox |