MI HB5577 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 425'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 425'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; dealer training and other general amendments to statute; provide for, and establish mobility dealer license certification. Amends secs. 248, 248h & 802 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.248 et seq.) & adds secs. 248k, 250a, 250b & 250c.
Title
Occupations; vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; dealer training and other general amendments to statute; provide for, and establish mobility dealer license certification. Amends secs. 248, 248h & 802 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.248 et seq.) & adds secs. 248k, 250a, 250b & 250c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 759 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 425'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/4/2017 @ 11:38 Am |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/3/2017 @ 7:44 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 4:20 Pm |
2016-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 759 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2016-06-02 | House | Transmitted |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 Yeas 96 Nays 12 |
2016-06-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-06-02 | House | Title Amended |
2016-06-01 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2016-06-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-06-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2016-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Eric Leutheuser |
Subjects
Disabilities: other
Occupations: vehicles, dealers and repair facilities
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Trade: vehicles
Occupations: vehicles, dealers and repair facilities
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Trade: vehicles