MI HB5572 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of I-94; designate as the "Washtenaw County Vietnam Veterans' Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2092) by adding sec. 18c.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of I-94; designate as the "Washtenaw County Vietnam Veterans' Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2092) by adding sec. 18c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 74 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 74 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmitted |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 74 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-12-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/30/2021 |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Ronnie Peterson |