MI HB5572 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-09 - Assigned Pa 317'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-09 - Assigned Pa 317'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; motor fuel tax; collection of tax and reporting by alternative fuel commercial users; revise. Amends sec. 154 of 2000 PA 403 (MCL 207.1154).
Title
Transportation; motor fuel tax; collection of tax and reporting by alternative fuel commercial users; revise. Amends sec. 154 of 2000 PA 403 (MCL 207.1154).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 586 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-09 | House | Assigned Pa 317'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-11-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/3/2016 @ 11:22 Am |
2016-11-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/2/2016 @ 3:22 Pm |
2016-11-09 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/1/2016 @ 11:34 Am |
2016-11-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/20/2016 |
2016-11-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-11-09 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 586 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2016-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2016-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 Yeas 102 Nays 5 |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-09-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-09-15 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2016-09-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2016-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |