MI HB5570 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: motor fuel tax; moratorium on motor fuel tax; provide for. Amends secs. 8 & 152 of 2000 PA 403 (MCL 207.1008 & 207.1152).
Title
Transportation: motor fuel tax; moratorium on motor fuel tax; provide for. Amends secs. 8 & 152 of 2000 PA 403 (MCL 207.1008 & 207.1152).
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Rep. Andrew Beeler [R] | Rep. Gary Eisen [R] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] |
Rep. David Martin [R] | Rep. Sue Allor [R] | Rep. Ken Borton [R] | Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 85 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 (Y: 63 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 (Y: 63 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2022-04-12 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 04/01/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/21/2022 01:36 Pm |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 85 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-03-09 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-09 | House | Title Amended |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 Yeas 63 Nays 39 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-03-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-03-09 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-12-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/30/2021 |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2021-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |