MI HB5569 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Assigned Pa 191'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Assigned Pa 191'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement: funds; maintenance of effort requirements; modify for secondary road patrol and traffic accident prevention. Amends sec. 77 of 1846 RS 14 (MCL 51.77).
Title
Law enforcement: funds; maintenance of effort requirements; modify for secondary road patrol and traffic accident prevention. Amends sec. 77 of 1846 RS 14 (MCL 51.77).
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Brann [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | House | Assigned Pa 191'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-09-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/27/2022 01:34 Pm |
2022-09-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 09/27/2022 10:06 Am |
2022-09-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/26/2022 03:05 Pm |
2022-09-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 Yeas 33 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-04-13 | House | Transmitted |
2022-04-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 Yeas 101 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-04-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-04-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-04-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-12-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/30/2021 |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Tommy Brann |