MI HB5558 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health: abortion; knowingly performing research on a dead fetus, embryo, or neonate obtained from an abortion; prohibit. Amends secs. 2688, 2690 & 2836 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2688 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health: abortion; knowingly performing research on a dead fetus, embryo, or neonate obtained from an abortion; prohibit. Amends secs. 2688, 2690 & 2836 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2688 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 42 (Y: 55 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2022-02-09HouseTransmitted
2022-02-09HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 42 Yeas 55 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2022-02-09HouseRead A Third Time
2022-02-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2022-02-08HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2022-02-08HouseRead A Second Time
2021-12-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-12-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-12-02HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
2021-11-30HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/10/2021
2021-11-10HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2021-11-10HouseRead A First Time
2021-11-10HouseIntroduced By Representative Thomas Albert

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5558
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5558.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-5558.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5558-0M285.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5558-A0119F99.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5558-E849FEA0.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5558-E4275934.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5558-45570DA1.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5558-1E97A765.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-07-099.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-02-09-012.htm

Bill Comments

feedback