MI HB5557 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 510'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 510'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; downtown development authorities; capture of certain taxes; modify. Amends sec. 13c of 1975 PA 197 (MCL 125.1663c).
Title
Economic development; downtown development authorities; capture of certain taxes; modify. Amends sec. 13c of 1975 PA 197 (MCL 125.1663c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 958 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 510'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:32 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:34 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:36 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 958 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2012-09-27 | House | Transmitted |
2012-09-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 Yeas 93 Nays 14 |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-04-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/25/2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-04-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-04-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Margaret O'brien |