MI HB5555 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Assigned Pa 96'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Assigned Pa 96'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security: employers; payment of taxes and contributions; allow certain contributing employers to pay quarterly under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 13 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.13).
Title
Employment security: employers; payment of taxes and contributions; allow certain contributing employers to pay quarterly under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 13 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.13).
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allor [R] | Rep. Ken Borton [R] | Rep. Bradley Slagh [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Griffin [R] |
Rep. Gary Eisen [R] | Rep. Phil Green [R] | Rep. Steven Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 108 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 108 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | House | Assigned Pa 96'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-06-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/14/2022 02:44 Pm |
2022-06-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/14/2022 11:50 Am |
2022-06-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/02/2022 11:36 Am |
2022-05-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-05-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-05-26 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2022-03-10 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 108 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-11-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/10/2021 |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Sue Allor |