MI HB5554 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; local development financing; issuance of a refunding obligation; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2152).
Title
Economic development; local development financing; issuance of a refunding obligation; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2152).
Sponsors
Rep. Barb Byrum [D] | Rep. Jeff Mayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2010-03-16 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-16 | Title Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 77 Yeas 99 Nays 8 | |
2010-03-16 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-16 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-16 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-01-21 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-01-21 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-10-28 | Printed Bill Filed 10/28/2009 | |
2009-10-27 | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Services | |
2009-10-27 | Read A First Time | |
2009-10-27 | Introduced By Representative Barb Byrum |