MI HB5553 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
Pending: Senate Economic And Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
Pending: Senate Economic And Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security: other; claims for unemployment benefits; require the unemployment agency to process within a certain number of days. Amends sec. 32 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.32) & adds sec. 32g. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5554'21
Title
Employment security: other; claims for unemployment benefits; require the unemployment agency to process within a certain number of days. Amends sec. 32 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.32) & adds sec. 32g. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5554'21
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Lightner [R] | Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] | Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] |
Sen. Michele Hoitenga [R] | Rep. Pat Outman [R] | Sen. Roger Hauck [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] |
Rep. Sue Allor [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 14 (Y: 69 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2022-01-26 | House | Transmitted |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Amended |
2022-01-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 14 Yeas 69 Nays 33 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-01-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-01-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-01-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-11-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/10/2021 |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Lightner |