MI HB5553 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; tax increment financing; issuance of a refunding obligation; provide for. Amends sec. 1 of 1980 PA 450 (MCL 125.1801).
Title
Economic development; tax increment financing; issuance of a refunding obligation; provide for. Amends sec. 1 of 1980 PA 450 (MCL 125.1801).
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Mayes [D] | Rep. Tim Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2010-03-16 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-16 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 76 Yeas 99 Nays 8 | |
2010-03-16 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-16 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-16 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-01-21 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-01-21 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-10-28 | Printed Bill Filed 10/28/2009 | |
2009-10-27 | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Services | |
2009-10-27 | Read A First Time | |
2009-10-27 | Introduced By Representative Tim Melton |