MI HB5548 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Michigan business tax; gross receipts; receipts from the administration of certain prescribed drugs; exclude. Amends sec. 111 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1111).
Title
Michigan business tax; gross receipts; receipts from the administration of certain prescribed drugs; exclude. Amends sec. 111 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1111).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2010-06-24 | Transmitted | |
2010-06-24 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 293 Yeas 102 Nays 2 | |
2010-06-24 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-12-02 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-12-02 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-10-28 | Printed Bill Filed 10/28/2009 | |
2009-10-27 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-10-27 | Read A First Time | |
2009-10-27 | Introduced By Representative Kathy Angerer |