MI HB5543 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absent voters; election options on absent voter ballot applications; modify and expand. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).
Title
Elections; absent voters; election options on absent voter ballot applications; modify and expand. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Paquette [R] | Rep. Ann Bollin [R] | Rep. Ryan Berman [R] | Rep. David LaGrand [D] |
Rep. Leslie Love [D] | Rep. Padma Kuppa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2020-02-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Brad Paquette |
Subjects
Elections: absent voters
Elections: election officials
Elections: presidential primary
Elections: primary
State agencies (existing): state
Elections: election officials
Elections: presidential primary
Elections: primary
State agencies (existing): state
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5543 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5543.htm |