MI HB5542 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Assigned Pa 336'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; expunction; setting aside certain convictions for victims of human trafficking violations; provide for. Amends sec. 1 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; expunction; setting aside certain convictions for victims of human trafficking violations; provide for. Amends sec. 1 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-01 - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 649 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-14HouseAssigned Pa 336'16 With Immediate Effect
2016-12-14HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/14/2016 @ 3:20 Pm
2016-12-14HouseApproved By The Governor 12/14/2016 @ 10:44 Am
2016-12-06HousePresented To The Governor 12/5/2016 @ 4:20 Pm
2016-12-01HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2016-12-01HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2016-12-01SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 649 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2016-11-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2016-11-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2016-09-08SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2016-09-08SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2016-09-08SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2016-05-18SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2016-05-17HouseTransmitted
2016-05-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2016-05-17HouseRead A Third Time
2016-05-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2016-05-12HouseRead A Second Time
2016-05-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2016-05-03HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2016-04-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2016
2016-04-12HouseReferred To Committee On Criminal Justice
2016-04-12HouseRead A First Time
2016-04-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Laura Cox

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2016-HB-5542
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2016-HIB-5542.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billengrossed/House/htm/2016-HEBH-5542.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billengrossed/House/htm/2016-HEBS-5542.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billenrolled/House/htm/2016-HNB-5542.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/publicact/htm/2016-PA-0336.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/House/htm/2016-HJ-05-03-041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/House/htm/2016-HJ-05-17-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/Senate/htm/2016-SJ-09-08-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/Journal/Senate/htm/2016-SJ-12-01-073.htm

Bill Comments

feedback