MI HB5541 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Assigned Pa 92'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Assigned Pa 92'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State: identification cards; designation as an individual with a communication impediment; allow in official state personal identification card and provide for law enforcement access, and make other general revisions. Amends secs. 1 & 2 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.291 & 28.292)
Title
State: identification cards; designation as an individual with a communication impediment; allow in official state personal identification card and provide for law enforcement access, and make other general revisions. Amends secs. 1 & 2 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.291 & 28.292)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 230 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Assigned Pa 92'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/23/2020 03:12 Pm |
2020-06-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/23/2020 02:31 Pm |
2020-06-11 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/11/2020 11:55 Am |
2020-06-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-10 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 230 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-10 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-09 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-06-09 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-05-27 | House | Transmitted |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-02-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Frank Liberati |
Subjects
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): state police
State: identification cards
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): state police
State: identification cards