MI HB5539 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2018 @ 2:56 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Law enforcement; other; potential harm or criminal acts in the student safety act; include sexual abuse, assault, and rape. Amends sec. 3 of 2013 PA 183 (MCL 752.913).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement; other; potential harm or criminal acts in the student safety act; include sexual abuse, assault, and rape. Amends sec. 3 of 2013 PA 183 (MCL 752.913).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 660 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 408 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-18HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/17/2018 @ 2:56 Pm
2018-12-18HouseAssigned Pa 371'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-18HouseApproved By The Governor 12/17/2018 @ 10:34 Am
2018-12-11HousePresented To The Governor 12/7/2018 @ 2:08 Pm
2018-12-04HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-04HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-04HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-04SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-04SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 660 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-12-04SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-04SenateRules Suspended
2018-12-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-12-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-06-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-06-07SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-06-07SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-05-29SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-05-24HouseTransmitted
2018-05-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 408 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2018-05-24HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-05-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-24HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-23HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-02-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/08/2018
2018-02-08HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2018-02-08HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-08HouseIntroduced By Representative Kim Lasata

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5539
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5539.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5539.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5539.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5539.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0371.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-23-052.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-24-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-06-07-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-04-074.htm

Bill Comments

feedback