MI HB5531 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 145'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Education; discipline; provision related to suspension or expulsion of a student; modify. Amends sec. 1311 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1311).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; discipline; provision related to suspension or expulsion of a student; modify. Amends sec. 1311 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1311).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAssigned Pa 145'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-05-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 5/10/2018 @ 11:04 Am
2018-05-10HouseApproved By The Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:50 Pm
2018-05-02HousePresented To The Governor 5/2/2018 @ 9:58 Am
2018-04-26SenateInserted Full Title
2018-04-26SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-04-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-04-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-04-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-04-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-03-13SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-04-26HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-04-26HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-04-26HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-03-08HouseTransmitted
2018-03-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 Yeas 93 Nays 14
2018-03-08HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-07HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-03-07HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-02-08HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/07/2018
2018-02-07HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2018-02-07HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Lana Theis

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5531
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5531.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5531.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5531.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5531.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0145.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-27-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-08-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-12-035.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-26-041.htm

Bill Comments

feedback